IA SF2247 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 10:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 10:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to grandparent and great-grandparent visitation. (Formerly SF 281.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to grandparent and great-grandparent visitation. (Formerly SF 281.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Rizer, Baltimore and Lensing. H.J. 577. |
2018-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 569. |
2018-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 567. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 632. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 632. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5139 filed, adopted. S.J. 631. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 627. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 296. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 287. |
Same As/Similar To
SF281 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.