IA SF2236 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 784.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to mechanics’ liens, public construction liens, and the early release of retained funds. (Formerly SSB 3039.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to mechanics’ liens, public construction liens, and the early release of retained funds. (Formerly SSB 3039.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 784.
2018-03-27SenateHF 2233 substituted. S.J. 783.
2018-03-27SenateAmendment S-5020 adopted. S.J. 783.
2018-03-27SenateAmendment S-5014 withdrawn. S.J. 782.
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692.
2018-02-27SenateAttached to similar HF 2233. S.J. 463.
2018-02-20SenateAmendment S-5020 filed. S.J. 405.
2018-02-19SenateAmendment S-5014 filed. S.J. 377.
2018-02-12SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 294.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 285.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3039 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback