IA SF2231 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of styles and materials used for residential building exteriors. (Formerly SSB 3040.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of styles and materials used for residential building exteriors. (Formerly SSB 3040.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 678. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | HF 2388 substituted. S.J. 677. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5052 adopted. S.J. 677. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5052 filed. S.J. 460. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Attached to HF 2388. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 229. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 224. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3040 (Related) 2024-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2231.
HSB619 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2388.
HF2388 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
HSB619 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2388.
HF2388 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.