IA SF2231 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practices and procedures of the state public defender. (Formerly SSB 3061.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practices and procedures of the state public defender. (Formerly SSB 3061.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 753. | |
2012-04-03 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 719. | |
2012-04-03 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 719. | |
2012-03-28 | Message from House. S.J. 676. | |
2012-03-27 | Immediate message. H.J. 668. | |
2012-03-27 | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 665. | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 627. | |
2012-03-06 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 459. | |
2012-03-01 | Subcommittee, Garrett, Gaines, and Pearson. H.J. 407. | |
2012-02-29 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 382. | |
2012-02-28 | Message from Senate. H.J. 359. | |
2012-02-28 | Immediate message. S.J. 379. | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 378. | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 286. | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 282. |