IA SF2221 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring background checks for school bus drivers and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3003.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act requiring background checks for school bus drivers and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3003.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 736. | |
2012-04-02 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 702. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 702. | |
2012-03-27 | Message from Senate. H.J. 646. | |
2012-03-26 | Immediate message. S.J. 659. | |
2012-03-26 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 656. | |
2012-03-26 | Senate concurred with S-5112. S.J. 656. | |
2012-03-21 | Amendment S-5112 filed. S.J. 613. | |
2012-03-21 | Message from House, with amendment S-5112. S.J. 613. | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate message. H.J. 597. | |
2012-03-20 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 595. | |
2012-03-20 | Committee amendment H-8133 adopted. H.J. 595. | |
2012-03-07 | Committee amendment H-8133 filed. H.J. 478. | |
2012-03-07 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 478. | |
2012-03-01 | Subcommittee, Dolecheck, Chambers, and Steckman. H.J. 407. | |
2012-02-29 | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 382. | |
2012-02-28 | Message from Senate. H.J. 359. | |
2012-02-28 | Immediate message. S.J. 384. | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 379. | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 276. | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 272. |