IA SF2207 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to meat and poultry inspection, by providing an exception for certain establishments engaged in the slaughter of poultry and the preparation of poultry products on a custom basis.(Formerly SSB 3031.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to meat and poultry inspection, by providing an exception for certain establishments engaged in the slaughter of poultry and the preparation of poultry products on a custom basis.(Formerly SSB 3031.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 580. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | HF 2257 substituted. S.J. 579. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5080 filed, adopted. S.J. 579. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Attached to HF 2257. S.J. 390. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 201. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 197. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3031 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2207.
HSB559 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2257.
HF2257 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
HSB559 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2257.
HF2257 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.