IA SF2199 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to interpreters and translators for limited English proficient participants in legal proceedings and in court-ordered programs. (Formerly SSB 3026.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to interpreters and translators for limited English proficient participants in legal proceedings and in court-ordered programs. (Formerly SSB 3026.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee, Hagenow, Anderson, and Hess. H.J. 370. |
2014-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 342. |
2014-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 336. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 382. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 2. S.J. 381. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 275. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 266. |