IA SF2198 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - Subcommittee, Gustafson, Bacon, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 345.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - Subcommittee, Gustafson, Bacon, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 345.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of experimental treatments for patients with a terminal illness. (Formerly SSB 1264.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of experimental treatments for patients with a terminal illness. (Formerly SSB 1264.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee, Gustafson, Bacon, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 345. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 333. |
2016-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 317. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 337. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 332. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Amendments S-5010 adopted. S.J. 331. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5010 filed. S.J. 275. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 247. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 238. |