IA SF2195 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - Subcommittee, Salmon, Gassman, and Mascher. H.J. 345.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - Subcommittee, Salmon, Gassman, and Mascher. H.J. 345.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring that human growth and development instruction by school boards include age-appropriate information regarding dating violence and prevention. (Formerly SF 2077.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring that human growth and development instruction by school boards include age-appropriate information regarding dating violence and prevention. (Formerly SF 2077.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee, Salmon, Gassman, and Mascher. H.J. 345. |
2016-02-24 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 316. |
2016-02-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 301. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 326. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 325. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 244. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 238. |