IA SF2193 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Subcommittee, Willems, Cownie, and Kearns. H.J. 619.
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Subcommittee, Willems, Cownie, and Kearns. H.J. 619.
Summary
A bill for an act requiring employers to provide written information to employees about certain employment policies without written requests from employees and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2011.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring employers to provide written information to employees about certain employment policies without written requests from employees and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2011.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Subcommittee, Willems, Cownie, and Kearns. H.J. 619. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time, referred to Labor. H.J. 539. | |
2010-02-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 522. | |
2010-02-15 | Immediate message. S.J. 360. | |
2010-02-15 | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 17. S.J. 358. | |
2010-02-04 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 283. | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 279. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0747B&ga=83 |