IA SF2189 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of moneys appropriated to support therapeutic classrooms, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3044.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of moneys appropriated to support therapeutic classrooms, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3044.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Garrett, and Winckler. S.J. 268. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 244. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 202. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 194. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB520 (Related) 2024-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2631.
SSB3044 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2189.
HF2631 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - NOBA: House Floor
SSB3044 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2189.
HF2631 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - NOBA: House Floor