IA SF2188 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prescription authority for certain psychologists and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2075.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to prescription authority for certain psychologists and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2075.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Failed to pass Senate (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Failed to pass Senate (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 764. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 798. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 33, nays 16. S.J. 794. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5175. S.J. 794. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5175. S.J. 784. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 746. |
2016-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 72, nays 22. H.J. 745. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8283 filed, adopted. H.J. 745. |
2016-04-25 | House | Substituted for HF 2334. H.J. 745. |
2016-04-11 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 612. |
2016-04-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 605. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 639. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 22. S.J. 637. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5044 out of order. S.J. 637. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5111 adopted. S.J. 637. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5044 deferred. S.J. 637. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote on amendment S-5044 prevailed. S.J. 637. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote prevailed, ayes 31, nays 19. S.J. 636. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5111 filed. S.J. 621. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on S-5044. S.J. 621. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 470. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on bill. S.J. 412. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate, ayes 24, nays 25. S.J. 402. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5044 filed, adopted. S.J. 402. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 302. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 231. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 227. |