IA SF2185 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the determination of native horses for purposes of pari-mutuel wagering. (Formerly SSB 3151.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act concerning the determination of native horses for purposes of pari-mutuel wagering. (Formerly SSB 3151.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 719. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 618. |
2014-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 542. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 537. |
2014-03-11 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 478. |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Drake, Grassley, and Hunter. H.J. 379. |
2014-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 342. |
2014-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 335. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 387. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 385. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 261. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 253. |