IA SF2185 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the supervision of physician assistants. (Formerly SSB 3053.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the supervision of physician assistants. (Formerly SSB 3053.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 700. | |
2012-03-27 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 673. | |
2012-03-27 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 673. | |
2012-03-21 | Message from House. S.J. 643. | |
2012-03-21 | Immediate message. H.J. 627. | |
2012-03-21 | Passed House, ayes 88, nays 5. H.J. 626. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 575. | |
2012-03-06 | Subcommittee, Koester, Mascher, and Massie. H.J. 458. | |
2012-03-06 | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 419. | |
2012-02-28 | Message from Senate. H.J. 358. | |
2012-02-28 | Immediate message. S.J. 390. | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 384. | |
2012-02-14 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 253. | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 249. |