IA SF2181 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 692.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act prohibiting the mistreatment of animals other than livestock and wild animals, providing for the rescue of animals by local law enforcement agencies, providing for criminal offenses and court orders, and including penalties. (Formerly SF 313, SF 421.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act prohibiting the mistreatment of animals other than livestock and wild animals, providing for the rescue of animals by local law enforcement agencies, providing for criminal offenses and court orders, and including penalties. (Formerly SF 313, SF 421.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 692.
2018-02-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 242.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 237.

Same As/Similar To

SF313 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF421 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback