IA SF2180 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the construction and maintenance of rumble strips on certain highways. (Formerly SSB 3101.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring the construction and maintenance of rumble strips on certain highways. (Formerly SSB 3101.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 245. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 234. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2004 (Similar To) 2020-02-12 - Fiscal note.
SSB3101 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2180.
SSB3101 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2180.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2180 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2180.html |