IA SF2179 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the possession of contraband in or on the grounds of a community-based correctional facility, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 2105.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the possession of contraband in or on the grounds of a community-based correctional facility, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 2105.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 659. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | HF 2255 substituted. S.J. 658. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2255. S.J. 431. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 241. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 237. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2094 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 371.
SF2105 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2255 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
SF2105 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2255 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2179 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2179.html |