IA SF2176 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of lascivious conduct with a minor, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3041.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of lascivious conduct with a minor, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3041.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseReferred to Judiciary. H.J. 594.
2018-03-07HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 492.
2018-03-06HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 474.
2018-03-06SenateImmediate message. S.J. 540.
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 538.
2018-02-07SenateFiscal note.
2018-02-05SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 230.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 226.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3041 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB577 (Related) 2018-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2249 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 594.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback