IA SF2175 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 918.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to partition of property in kind and partition of property by sale. (Formerly SSB 3065.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to partition of property in kind and partition of property by sale. (Formerly SSB 3065.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 918.
2018-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 901.
2018-03-28SenateMessage from House. S.J. 808.
2018-03-28HouseImmediate message. H.J. 699.
2018-03-28HousePassed House, ayes 99, nays 1. H.J. 694.
2018-03-22HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
2018-03-16HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 599.
2018-03-07HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee: Rizer, Hein and Meyer. H.J. 426.
2018-02-21HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 334.
2018-02-20HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 327.
2018-02-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 388.
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 385.
2018-02-05SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 230.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 226.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3065 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback