IA SF2157 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 913.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 913.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the recording requirements for certain residential real estate installment sales contracts and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3032.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the recording requirements for certain residential real estate installment sales contracts and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3032.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 913. | |
2010-03-16 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 863. | |
2010-03-16 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 863. | |
2010-03-10 | Message from House. S.J. 754. | |
2010-03-09 | Immediate message. H.J. 867. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 863. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 816. | |
2010-02-18 | Subcommittee, Wenthe, Helland, and Jacoby. H.J. 619. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 538. | |
2010-02-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 521. | |
2010-02-15 | Immediate message. S.J. 402. | |
2010-02-15 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 401. | |
2010-02-01 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 229. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 228. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0710B&ga=83 |