IA SF2153 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:15AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:15AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of physical examinations and student health screenings by school districts. (Formerly SSB 3067.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of physical examinations and student health screenings by school districts. (Formerly SSB 3067.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2020-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2020 1:15PM House Lounge. |
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee: Shipley, Gaines and Hanusa. H.J. 444. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 400. |
2020-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 394. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 437. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 436. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5023 adopted, as amended. S.J. 436. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5030 to S-5023 filed, adopted. S.J. 436. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5023 filed. S.J. 427. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 220. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 211. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3067 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2153.