IA SF2149 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the minimum standard of transparency for motor vehicle window tint, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the minimum standard of transparency for motor vehicle window tint, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-02-05SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 8:45AM RM G17.
2020-02-05SenateSubcommittee: Brown, Lykam, and Zumbach. S.J. 218.
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 203.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback