IA SF2148 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2385. S.J. 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2385. S.J. 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the child abuse hotline. (See SF 2385.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the child abuse hotline. (See SF 2385.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2385. S.J. 398. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 2:00PM RM G17. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Garrett, and Jochum. S.J. 305. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 203. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2385 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2148 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2148.html |