IA SF2146 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reporting burn injuries to law enforcement. (See SF 2376.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to reporting burn injuries to law enforcement. (See SF 2376.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 215. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 190. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2376 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 693.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2146 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2146.html |