IA SF2146 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 649.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 649.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to meeting requirements for rural water districts. (Formerly SSB 3070.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to meeting requirements for rural water districts. (Formerly SSB 3070.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 649. | |
2012-03-20 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 610. | |
2012-03-20 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 610. | |
2012-03-12 | Message from House. S.J. 507. | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate message. H.J. 489. | |
2012-03-08 | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 485. | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment H-8119 withdrawn. H.J. 485. | |
2012-03-08 | Substituted for HF 2394. H.J. 484. | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment H-8119 filed. H.J. 460. | |
2012-02-28 | Passed on file. H.J. 375. | |
2012-02-28 | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 360. | |
2012-02-28 | Message from Senate. H.J. 342. | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate message. S.J. 347. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 344. | |
2012-02-08 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 216. | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 213. |