IA SF2145 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2280. S.J. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2280. S.J. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act limiting the release of personal information maintained by the department of transportation to out-of-state persons, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2280.)
Title
A bill for an act limiting the release of personal information maintained by the department of transportation to out-of-state persons, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2280.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2280. S.J. 262. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 2:00PM Room 315. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Bisignano, and Webster. S.J. 183. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 166. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2280 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 262.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2145 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2145.html |