IA SF2135 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 698.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 698.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the failure to wear a motor vehicle safety belt or safety harness. (Formerly SSB 3044.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the failure to wear a motor vehicle safety belt or safety harness. (Formerly SSB 3044.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 698. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 698. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 532. |
2018-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 459. |
2018-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 576. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 58 nays 38. H.J. 457. |
2018-03-05 | House | Substituted for HF 2412. H.J. 456. |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 333. |
2018-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 327. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 384. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 384. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 185. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 180. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3044 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.