IA SF2133 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a jobs and infrastructure revolving fund and program administered by the Iowa finance authority, and making appropriations.(See SF 2413.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a jobs and infrastructure revolving fund and program administered by the Iowa finance authority, and making appropriations.(See SF 2413.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 608. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2024 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 355. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 320. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 307. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Bisignano, and Dawson. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 159. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2413 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps