IA SF2133 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to traffic violations involving the approach of certain stationary vehicles, including by providing for reporting of violations, requiring investigations, and providing for enforcement against vehicle owners.(Formerly SSB 3019.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to traffic violations involving the approach of certain stationary vehicles, including by providing for reporting of violations, requiring investigations, and providing for enforcement against vehicle owners.(Formerly SSB 3019.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 161. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 156. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3019 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2133.
HSB557 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326.
HF2326 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 218.
HSB557 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326.
HF2326 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 218.