IA SF212 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported out of committee as SF 346. S.J. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of female genital mutilation and providing penalties. (See SF 346.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of female genital mutilation and providing penalties. (See SF 346.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateReported out of committee as SF 346. S.J. 383.
2019-02-11SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Sweeney. S.J. 273.
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 254.

Same As/Similar To

HSB115 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
SF346 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Fiscal note.
HF534 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 809.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback