IA SF2113 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 4:00PM RM 315.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for prescription insulin drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for prescription insulin drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 4:00PM RM 315.
2020-02-05SenateSubcommittee: Koelker, Chapman, and Petersen. S.J. 217.
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 174.

Same As/Similar To

HSB501 (Related) 2020-01-22 - Committee report, approving bill. H.J. 126.
HF2138 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Amendment H-8016 filed. H.J. 287.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback