IA SF2113 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - Subcommittee, J. Smith, Arnold, and Hanson. H.J. 458.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - Subcommittee, J. Smith, Arnold, and Hanson. H.J. 458.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the identification of owners of blinds and stands for hunting deer and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3058.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the identification of owners of blinds and stands for hunting deer and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3058.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Subcommittee, J. Smith, Arnold, and Hanson. H.J. 458. | |
2012-02-29 | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 381. | |
2012-02-28 | Message from Senate. H.J. 342. | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate message. S.J. 354. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 353. | |
2012-02-27 | Point of order raised on S-5027, ruled out of order. S.J. 353. | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment S-5027 filed. S.J. 353. | |
2012-02-27 | Deferred. S.J. 341. | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment S-5017 adopted. S.J. 341. | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment S-5017 filed. S.J. 295. | |
2012-02-01 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 169. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 164. |