IA SF2108 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 469.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 469.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to artisan's liens and Iowa's consumer frauds Act and making remedies applicable. (Formerly SSB 3038.) Effective 5-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to artisan's liens and Iowa's consumer frauds Act and making remedies applicable. (Formerly SSB 3038.) Effective 5-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 469. | |
2010-02-16 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 449. | |
2010-02-16 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 449. | |
2010-02-10 | Message from House. S.J. 322. | |
2010-02-09 | Immediate message. H.J. 304. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 302. | |
2010-02-09 | Substituted for HF 2252. H.J. 301. | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 249. | |
2010-02-03 | Message from Senate. H.J. 241. | |
2010-02-02 | Immediate message. S.J. 252. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 248. | |
2010-02-02 | Amendment S-5045 filed, adopted. S.J. 248. | |
2010-01-26 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 170. | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 159. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0660B&ga=83 |