IA SF2092 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Subcommittee, Forristall, Jorgensen, and Steckman. H.J. 237.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Subcommittee, Forristall, Jorgensen, and Steckman. H.J. 237.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the categorical state percent of growth for the school budget year beginning July 1, 2017. (Formerly SSB 3064.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the categorical state percent of growth for the school budget year beginning July 1, 2017. (Formerly SSB 3064.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Subcommittee, Forristall, Jorgensen, and Steckman. H.J. 237. |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 223. |
2016-02-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 184. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 179. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 179. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5003 ruled out of order. S.J. 179. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5003 filed. S.J. 178. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 153. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 149. |