IA SF2087 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 606.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 606.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the comprehensive financial report of the state and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3009.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the comprehensive financial report of the state and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3009.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 606. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | HF 2126 substituted. S.J. 605. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2126. S.J. 358. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 129. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 125. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3009 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2087.
HSB568 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2126.
HF2126 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
HSB568 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2126.
HF2126 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.