IA SF2067 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2341. S.J. 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2341. S.J. 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to victims of sexual assault including sexual abuse evidence, notification of rights, HIV-related testing of a convicted or alleged assailant, and testing, reporting, and counseling of a victim, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2341.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to victims of sexual assault including sexual abuse evidence, notification of rights, HIV-related testing of a convicted or alleged assailant, and testing, reporting, and counseling of a victim, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2341.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2341. S.J. 290. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Dawson, and Petersen. S.J. 127. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 115. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2350 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 211.
SF2341 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 290.
SF2341 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 290.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2067 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2067.html |