IA SF2059 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom. S.J. 127.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom. S.J. 127.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for education on the holocaust for students and teachers in school districts.
Title
A bill for an act providing for education on the holocaust for students and teachers in school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom. S.J. 127. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 114. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2197 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2457.
HF2457 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Amendments H-8048 and H-8049 filed. H.J. 398.
HF2457 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Amendments H-8048 and H-8049 filed. H.J. 398.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2059 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2059.html |