IA SF2012 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the use of safety belts or safety harnesses by passengers of motor vehicles, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the use of safety belts or safety harnesses by passengers of motor vehicles, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/15/2020 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Lykam, and Shipley. S.J. 70. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 51. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2003 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2012 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2012.html |