IA SF2011 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2118. S.J. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2118. S.J. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to loan repayment for refinanced eligible loans under the rural physician loan repayment program. (See SF 2118.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to loan repayment for refinanced eligible loans under the rural physician loan repayment program. (See SF 2118.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2118. S.J. 176. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Johnson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 70. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 51. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB558 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 296.
SF2118 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2461 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
SF2118 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2461 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2011 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2011.html |