IA SF2007 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making an appropriation to the college student aid commission for purposes of the national guard educational assistance program and including effective date provisions. Effective 1-31-12.
Title
A bill for an act making an appropriation to the college student aid commission for purposes of the national guard educational assistance program and including effective date provisions. Effective 1-31-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 149. | |
2012-01-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 138. | |
2012-01-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 138. | |
2012-01-30 | Message from House. S.J. 131. | |
2012-01-26 | Immediate message. H.J. 144. | |
2012-01-26 | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 142. | |
2012-01-26 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 142. | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 141. | |
2012-01-25 | Subcommittee, Committee of the Whole: Dolecheck, Chambers, Cohoon, Drake, Garrett, Gaskill, Hagenow, Hall, Heaton, Heddens, Huseman, Lukan, Murphy, T. Olson, Raecker, Rogers, Running-Marquardt, Schulte, Schultz, T. Taylor, Wagner, Watts, Wenthe, Winckler, and Worthan. H.J. 138. | |
2012-01-24 | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 128. | |
2012-01-24 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 128. | |
2012-01-23 | Subcommittee, Chambers, Kearns, and J. Taylor. H.J. 118. | |
2012-01-19 | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 109. | |
2012-01-18 | Message from Senate. H.J. 104. | |
2012-01-18 | Immediate message. S.J. 83. | |
2012-01-18 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 81. | |
2012-01-18 | Amendment S-5002 lost. S.J. 80. | |
2012-01-18 | Amendment S-5002 filed. S.J. 80. | |
2012-01-12 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 58. | |
2012-01-12 | Subcommittee, Schoenjahn, Danielson, and Dix. S.J. 56. | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 22. |