IA SF2004 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the advanced dyslexia specialist endorsement competitive grant program within the department of education and making appropriations.
Title
A bill for an act establishing the advanced dyslexia specialist endorsement competitive grant program within the department of education and making appropriations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 12:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 119. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 42. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2030 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2377.
HF2377 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2643.
HF2643 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - NOBA: House Full Approps
HF2377 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2643.
HF2643 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2004 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2004.html |