IA SF2002 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the second amendment preservation Act, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act creating the second amendment preservation Act, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Nunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 1:00PM Room 15 (legislative dining room) starting 9:30 a.m.. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Bisignano, and Shipley. S.J. 99. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 34. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2002 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2002.html |