IA SF2001 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state school foundation program and the calculation of minimum state foundation aid for school districts and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state school foundation program and the calculation of minimum state foundation aid for school districts and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rowley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 4:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Evans, Garrett, and Quirmbach. S.J. 119. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 41. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2001 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2001.html |