IA SF2001 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Chapman, and T. Taylor. S.J. 88.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Chapman, and T. Taylor. S.J. 88.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of home bakeries licensed by the department of inspections and appeals.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of home bakeries licensed by the department of inspections and appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Chapman, and T. Taylor. S.J. 88. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 49. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2211 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB645 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 295.
HF2513 (Similar To) 2020-02-25 - Amendment H-8031 filed. H.J. 369.
HSB645 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 295.
HF2513 (Similar To) 2020-02-25 - Amendment H-8031 filed. H.J. 369.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2001 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2001.html |