IA SF2 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a limitation on the amount of administrative costs for school districts.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a limitation on the amount of administrative costs for school districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 2:00PM RM 111. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Carlin, and Giddens. S.J. 111. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 20. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2.html |