IA SF196 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Lykam, and Zumbach. S.J. 108.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Lykam, and Zumbach. S.J. 108.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated traffic law enforcement systems by the department of transportation and regulating the use of other automated traffic law enforcement systems. (Formerly SSB 1019.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated traffic law enforcement systems by the department of transportation and regulating the use of other automated traffic law enforcement systems. (Formerly SSB 1019.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Lykam, and Zumbach. S.J. 108. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 837. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 220. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 219. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1019 (Related) 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF196 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF196.html |