IA SF194 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa military code and military service by making changes related to the use and support of certain facilities, operations support, employment and rank of active and retired military personnel, the definition of performing military duty, tort claims protections, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1047.) Various effective dates; see section 13 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa military code and military service by making changes related to the use and support of certain facilities, operations support, employment and rank of active and retired military personnel, the definition of performing military duty, tort claims protections, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1047.) Various effective dates; see section 13 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 994. | |
2011-04-11 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 956. | |
2011-04-11 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 956. | |
2011-04-05 | Message from House. S.J. 880. | |
2011-04-04 | Immediate message. H.J. 901. | |
2011-04-04 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 892. | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 741. | |
2011-03-09 | Subcommittee, Vander Linden, Muhlbauer, and J. Taylor. H.J. 644. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 606. | |
2011-03-09 | Message from Senate. H.J. 600. | |
2011-03-09 | Immediate message. S.J. 600. | |
2011-03-09 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 599. | |
2011-02-09 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 265. | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 261. |