IA SF192 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school funding by establishing the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth for the budget year beginning July 1, 2023, modifying provisions relating to the property tax replacement payments, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1081.) Effective date: 02/07/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to school funding by establishing the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth for the budget year beginning July 1, 2023, modifying provisions relating to the property tax replacement payments, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1081.) Effective date: 02/07/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1009? (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Shall amendment H–1008 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3012 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3011 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3010 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3009 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3010 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3012 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3011 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3010 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3009 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Shall amendment H–1008 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3012 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3011 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3010 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3009 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3010 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3012 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3011 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3010 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3009 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 279. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 279. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 270. |
2023-02-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 255. |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 59, nays 40. H.J. 254. |
2023-02-07 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 254. |
2023-02-07 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1009, 36 yeas, 63 nays. H.J. 253. |
2023-02-07 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-1009, ruled not germane. H.J. 253. |
2023-02-07 | House | Amendment H-1008, 39 yeas, 60 nays, lost. H.J. 252. |
2023-02-07 | House | Substituted for HF 171. H.J. 251. |
2023-02-06 | House | Amendments H-1008 and H-1009 filed. H.J. 249. |
2023-02-06 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 248. |
2023-02-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 245. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 250. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 344. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 15. S.J. 249. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3012 filed, lost. S.J. 248. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3011 filed, lost. S.J. 247. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3010 filed, lost. S.J. 247. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3009 filed, lost. S.J. 246. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 233. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 230. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1081 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 192.