IA SF189 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights proceedings based upon safety or security concerns. (See SF 275.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights proceedings based upon safety or security concerns. (See SF 275.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Petersen, and Sinclair. S.J. 226. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 214. |
Same As/Similar To
SF275 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF189 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF189.html |