IA SF180 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and programs of the economic development authority, including apprentice eligibility under the apprenticeship training program, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1026.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and programs of the economic development authority, including apprentice eligibility under the apprenticeship training program, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1026.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 384. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | HF 231 substituted. S.J. 383. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 231. S.J. 257. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 217. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 213. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB40 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178.
SSB1026 (Related) 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee: Smith, Brown, and Bisignano.
HF231 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 490.
SSB1026 (Related) 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee: Smith, Brown, and Bisignano.
HF231 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 490.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF180 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF180.html |